SOLENT NHS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SUPPORT SOLENT NHS TRUST BY PROVIDING FUNDS TO BENEFIT PATIENTS BY PURCHASING SUPPLEMENTARY AND COMPLIMENTARY EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES FOR WHICH THE TRUST WOULD BE UNABLE TO PROVIDE FUNDING FROM EXCHEQUER SOURCES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 1998: Standard registration
- 15 November 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PORTSMOUTH AND SOUTH EAST HAMPSHIRE CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.77k | £3.03k | £168.89k | £7.38k | £10.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.75k | £9.98k | £115.09k | £60.58k | £54.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 15/11/2011
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHILDRENS SERVICES CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST COMMUNITY NURSING SERVICES CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST EMSWORTH VICTORIA COTTAGE HOSPITAL CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST FAMILY PLANNING SERVICES CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST GOSPORT COMMUNITY HOSPITAL CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST HAVANT WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST LEARNING DISABILITIES CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST MEDICAL THERAPY SERVICES CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST MENTAL HEALTH CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST PETERSFIELD HOSPITAL CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST SERVICES FOR THE ELDERLY CHARITY
- THE PORTSMOUTH HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST ST CHRISTOPHERS HOSPITAL CHARITY
- 21 August 1998 : Standard registration
- 15 November 2024 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window