County Durham and Darlington NHS Foundation Trust Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity, with the help of invaluable contributions from supporters of our hospitalsand community services, provides an opportunity to undertake activities and enhance patient care that might otherwise not be possible. This includes the purchase of medical equipment, improvements to patient amenities and patient and staff education, above and beyond what is normally provided by the NHS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- North Yorkshire
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 03 May 1996: Standard registration
- 24 November 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
- COUNTY DURHAM AND DARLINGTON ACUTE HOSPITALS NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND AND RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CO DURHAM & DARLINGTON NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.00k | £872.00k | £520.00k | £488.00k | £346.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £770.00k | £885.00k | £553.00k | £553.00k | £554.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £811.00k | £457.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £6.00k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £55.00k | £51.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £48.00k | £59.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £779.00k | £432.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £106.00k | £121.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £12.00k | £14.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FURTHER THE GENERAL OR ANY SPECIFIC CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OF THE COUNTY DURHAM AND DARLINGTON NHS FOUNDATION TRUST OR FOR ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Linked charities
- ACCIDENT AND EMERGENCY CHARITY
- ANAESTHETICS CHARITY
- BEQUEST OF ROBERT FIDDERMAN FOR THE DARLINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
- BOOK OF REMEMBERANCE CHARITY
- BUSINESS MANAGEMENT CHARITY
- CANCER CHARITY
- CARDIOLOGY CHARITY
- CHAPLAINCY CHARITY
- CHARITABLE NORTH DURHAM ACUTE
- COMMUNITY HEALTH CARE NORTH DURHAM HEALTH PROMOTION SERVICES CHARITY
- COMMUNITY HEALTH CARE NORTH DURHAM PALLIATIVE CARE SERVICES CHARITY
- DERMATOLOGY CHARITY
- DIABETIC CHARITY
- DIETETIC CHARITY
- GASTROENTEROLOGY CHARITY
- GYNAECOLOGICAL RESEARCH CHARITY
- GYNAECOLOGY CHARITY
- HAEMATOLOGY CHARITY
- LIPID CLINIC CHARITY
- MEDICAL CHARITY
- MICROBIOLOGY CHARITY
- MINOR INJURIES CHARITY
- NORTH DURHAM GENERAL FUND
- NURSING AND QUALITY CHARITY
- OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY CHARITY
- ORTHOPAEDIC CHARITY
- PAIN MANAGEMENT UNIT CHARITY
- PALLIATIVE CARE SUPPORT CHARITY
- PATHOLOGY CHARITY
- PATIENTS WELFARE DRYBURN FUND
- PATIENTS WELFARE SHOTLEY BRIDGE FUND
- PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITY
- PLASTIC SURGERY CHARITY
- RADIOLOGY CHARITY
- RESPIRATORY DISEASE CHARITY
- RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH CHARITY
- SURGICAL CHARITY
- THE KENNETH MCKEOWN PRIZE FUND
- THE LADY EDEN WARD CHARITY
- THE NORTH DURHAM ACUTE HOSPITALS NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- THE POST GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITY
- UROLOGY/KIDNEY CHARITY
- WILLIAM DRYSDALE ENDOWMENT
- 03 May 1996 : Standard registration
- 24 November 2021 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Financial Services
Centre for Health
Whitehouse Business Park
Traynor Way
Peterlee
SR8 2RU
- Phone:
- 0191 569 2953
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window