CORNWALL CARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities are to promote relief, support and assistance to: (a) individuals who by reason of old age, physical or mental illness, require special care and attention; (b) children and young people who require special care and attention; (c) promote support and assistance to beneficiaries resident or associated with Cornwall, Devon or Isles of Scilly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£32,379,000
Donations and legacies | £1.00k | |
Charitable activities | £32.05m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.00k | |
Other | £327.00k |
Total expenditure:
£35,414,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £25.36m | |
Other | £10.05m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £15,295,973 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.05m | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.36m |
People

425 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Isles Of Scilly
Governance
- 05 March 1996: Standard registration
- CORNWALL CARE (Working name)
- CORNWALL COUNTY CARE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leanne Blackwood | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Whitmore | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Lee Warren | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Clarke-Kuehn | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Williams | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Lunt | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.42m | £39.38m | £40.38m | £46.55m | £32.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.83m | £38.02m | £40.18m | £47.54m | £35.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.20m | £15.30m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.66m | £2.23m | £525.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £265.00k | £65.00k | £50.00k | £33.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £39.31m | £40.33m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £35.11m | £0 | £0 | £45.97m | £32.05m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £40.00k | £0 | £0 | £545.00k | £327.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £35.83m | £38.02m | £40.18m | £47.54m | £25.36m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £41.00k | £209.59k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.05m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £31.63m | £31.81m | £32.30m | £30.57m | £29.70m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.07m | £4.36m | £8.21m | £5.26m | £9.35m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £19.57m | £19.69m | £20.48m | £20.42m | £29.63m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 1995 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1996,14 APRIL 1999 AND 26 JULY 2001 AND 20 MAY 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF AND PROVIDE RELIEF, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS WHO BY REASON OF OLD AGE OR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS OR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HANDICAP, REQUIRE SPECIAL CARE AND ATTENTION. 2) TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE RELIEF TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO REQUIRE SPECIAL CARE AND ATTENTION. IN THIS MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION "BENEFICIARIES" MEANS THE PEOPLE REFERRED TO IN (A) AND (B) ABOVE. 3) TO PROMOTE IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF AND SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE RESIDENT IN OR ASSOCIATED WITH THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL THE COUNTY OF DEVON OR THE ISLES OF SCILLY
Area of benefit
CORNWALL, DEVON AND THE ISLES OF SCILLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
SANCTUARY HOUSING ASSOCIATION
CHAMBER COURT
CASTLE STREET
WORCESTER
WR1 3ZQ
- Phone:
- 01872 597777
- Email:
- welcome@cornwallcare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window