Accounts and annual returns TEMPLE CLOUD VILLAGE HALL PROJECT

Charity Number: 1053501
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required