Accounts and annual returns COUNTY DURHAM AND DARLINGTON PRIORITY SERVICES NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1053505
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 23 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 13 October 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 13 October 2004 On Time