GREAT ALNE PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our concern is for the residents of Great Alne, particularly for the young and the elderly as well as those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 01 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Bennett | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sylvester Smith | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stewart Millard | Trustee | 04 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF HARRISON | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.07k | £1.08k | £1.07k | £1.10k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £811 | £1.25k | £640 | £1.06k | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1921 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION, UNDER S74(2)(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993, DATED 14 JULY 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT EITHER OF THE POOR OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT GENERALLY, OR OF SUCH DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT FOR THIS PURPOSE AND IN SUCH WAY AS THEY CONSIDER MOST ADVANTAGEOUS TO THE RECIPIENTS AND MOST CONDUCIVE TO THE FORMATION OF PROVIDENT HABITS.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 26 OF SCHEME). PROVIDING ALL LEGITIMATE OBLIGATIONS HAVE BEEN SATISFIED, THEN FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE PARISH OF GREAT ALNE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GREAT ALNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL TOP
HASELOR
ALCESTER
B49 6LX
- Phone:
- 01789488831
- Email:
- r.martyn.davey@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window