NORWICH SHOPMOBILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The loan of pavement vehicles; mobility scooters, powered and manual wheelchairs, to anyone who needs them to assist them to access Norwich city centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 06 March 1996: Standard registration
- 26 January 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.95k | £52.21k | £53.25k | £56.83k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.25k | £57.00k | £56.86k | £62.90k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 13 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 13 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 23 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
23 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 17 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
17 November 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22ND FEBRUARY 1995 .
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NORWICH AND ELSEWHERE IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK WHO ARE ELDERLY, DISABLED, INFIRM OR INCAPACITATED BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ITEMS AND FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR ITEMS SUCH AS WHEELCHAIRS AND SIMILAR EQUIPMENT, THEREBY INCREASING THE MOBILITY OF SUCH PERSONS, AND ENABLING THEM TO HAVE IMPROVED ACCESS TO NORWICH CITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
NORWICH AND NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window