Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF DUNMOW CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1053540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 October 2024 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 October 2024 180 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required