THE RIDGEWAY COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a community centre with recreation and leisure facilities for the population of North Furzton and North Emerson Valley and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 11 March 1996: Standard registration
- 05 September 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1199024 WATLING VALLEY ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.96k | £24.58k | £23.55k | £28.32k | £28.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.96k | £25.47k | £23.17k | £26.23k | £25.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE INHABITANTS OF FURZTON NORTH, EMERSON VALLLEY NORTH AND DISTRICT (B)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THOSE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (C)TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
FURZTON NORTH, EMERSON VALLEY NORTH AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window