THE ASSOCIATION FOR PALLIATIVE MEDICINE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the advancement and development of palliative medicine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
93 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 08 March 1996: Standard registration
- 08 May 2017: Funds received from 1109748 THE PALLIATIVE CARE CONGRESS
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Suzanne Kite | Chair | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Paes | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Larsey Annan Ako-Otchere | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Perkin | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trudie Roiz de Sa | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Natasha Wiggins | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Dore | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.93k | £449.44k | £366.71k | £442.03k | £348.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £352.36k | £373.87k | £392.48k | £432.27k | £551.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 1996 as amended on 15 Mar 2018 as amended on 16 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF PALLIATIVE MEDICINE
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASSOCIATION FOR PALLIATIVE MEDICINE
Lancaster Court
8 Barnes Wallis Road
Fareham
PO15 5TU
- Phone:
- 01489668332
- Email:
- apm@compleat-online.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window