BRITISH ASIAN WOMENS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing information and advice to all asian women assist in provision of recreational activities guidance on improvement of health via sporting activities provide assistance on family issues encourage educational requirements
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABIDA AZEEMI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jabran Aziz | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Khalida Neelam Durrani | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £1.40k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £3.55k | £5.60k | £5.59k | £5.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2022 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH JANUARY 1996.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST WOMEN OF ASIAN DECENT BY (A) ASSISTING THE WOMEN TO OBTAIN TRAINING PLACES WITH A VIEW TO FINDING EMPLOYMENT; (B) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION IN THE AREAS OF WELFARE, HEALTH, HOUSING, EDUCATION AND IMMIGRATION; (C) THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING IN THE AREAS OF FAMILY ISSUES, HEALTH ISSUES, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, AND TO FIND REFUGES FOR VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN OF ASIAN DESCENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ENGLISH AND MOTHER TONGUE CLASSES. (3) THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY AND DISABLED ASIAN WOMEN IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE ABOUT, AND ACCESS TO FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED -- IN PRACTICE NEWHAM AND EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
92B HAMPTON ROAD
LONDON
E7 0NU
- Phone:
- 07866625795
- Email:
- abida.azeemi@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window