THE PRINCE'S TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 08 March 1996: Standard registration
- 08 February 2001: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 February 2001: Funds transferred to 1079675 THE KING'S TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7TH MARCH 1996 AND 19 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS THE MENTAL SPIRITUAL MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED INCLUDING: (I) PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE; (II) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION, ENCOURAGEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, INSTRUCTION OR TRAINING IN PROFESSIONS, VOCATIONS, INDUSTRIES, CRAFTS, TRADES OR THE SKILLS NEEDED IN EMPLOYMENT; (III) RELIEVING POVERTY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE (INCLUDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE) AND ENCOURAGEMENT WHILST THEIR EDUCATION IS BEING ADVANCE AS AFORESAID OR WHILST THEY ARE IN THE PROCESS OF ESTABLISHING NEW BUSINESSES OR PREPARING FOR ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGING IN A PROFESSION, TRADE, CRAFT OR SERVICE; (IV) ARRANGING PERIODS OF VOLUNTARY WORK IN THE COMMUNITY; (V) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING YOUNG PEOPLE IN UNDERSTANDING OF AND PRACTICAL ACTION IN SUPPORT OF THE NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENT. (B) TO PROMOTE AND CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO SOCIAL CONDITIONS AFFECTING YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (C) TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNCIL SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.