Trustees ROYAL BROMPTON AND HAREFIELD HOSPITALS CHARITY
Charity number: 1053584

Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Blake | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Antonio de Marvao | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Julia Winter | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Priya Ponnaiyah | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Corbyn | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Putter | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bault | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.