THE SOCIETY OF ANAESTHETISTS OF WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to promote the study, knowledge and practice of the science of anesthesia, intensive clinical care and pain relief. Bursaries are available to support medical students working overseas.Prizes for research, audit and case reports are awarded at the biannual meetings The charity supports mothers of Africa in their aim of reducing maternal and child mortality in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIMON LOGAN | Trustee | 23 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor judith hall OBE | Trustee | 12 October 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.26k | £7.13k | £14.60k | £6.82k | £15.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.01k | £4.53k | £12.51k | £6.87k | £14.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OR ADVANCE THE STUDY KNOWLEDGE AND PRACTICE OF THE SCIENCE OF ANAESTHESIA, INTENSIVE CLINICAL CARE AND PAIN RELIEF
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Is-y-Coed
Star Lane
Capel Llanilltern
Cardiff
CF5 6JH
- Phone:
- 02920890465
- Email:
- secretary.saw@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window