AUSTREY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Austrey Pre-School Group provides education and development support to children aged 2yrs to 4yrs in accordance with the Early Years Foundation Stage guidelines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Total income includes £35,676 from 200516 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 16 March 1996: Standard registration
- 09 July 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- AUSTREY PRE-SCHOOL GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.76k | £47.20k | £51.55k | £46.33k | £44.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.50k | £51.68k | £48.16k | £47.15k | £47.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £33.03k | £38.02k | £38.02k | £35.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 30 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 30 April 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 17 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 17 May 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 23 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2016
(These accounts |
23 April 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 15 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2015
(These accounts |
16 April 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/09/1995 AS AMENDED ON 30/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window