Accounts and annual returns HESTERS WAY NEIGHBOURHOOD PROJECT

Charity Number: 1053694
Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 March 2022 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 March 2022 407 days late Download Open in new window