RUSKIN MILL LAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The leasing of the charity?s property estate for charitable use in accordance with the charity's Objects and the research into educational methods for the training and education of young people with learning difficulties, behavioural problems or special educational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£4,239,981
Donations and legacies | £764.37k | |
Charitable activities | £1.86m | |
Other trading activities | £1.61m | |
Investments | £406 | |
Other | £509 |
Total expenditure:
£3,483,549
Raising funds | £588.01k | |
Charitable activities | £884.26k | |
Other | £2.01m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.60m | |
Charitable expenditure | £884.26k | |
Retained for future use | £756.43k |
People

36 Employee(s)
1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Darlington
- Dudley
- Gloucestershire
- North Yorkshire
- Pembrokeshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 11 March 1996: Standard registration
- FREEMAN COLLEGE (Working name)
- GLASSHOUSE COLLEGE (Working name)
- RUSKIN MILL COLLEGE (Working name)
- RUSKIN MILL FURTHER EDUCATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- RUSKIN MILL FURTHER EDUCATION COURSE (Previous name)
- THE RUSKIN MILL EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUSKIN MILL LAND TRUST LIMITED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.84m | £2.25m | £2.85m | £3.55m | £4.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00m | £1.91m | £2.58m | £2.90m | £3.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £987.90k | £322.58k | £644.17k | £885.61k | £764.37k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £272.47k | £302.15k | £836.53k | £0 | £1.61m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.09m | £1.11m | £1.35m | £2.66m | £1.86m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £406 | |
|
Income - Other | £496.19k | £514.12k | £20.85k | £0 | £509 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.25m | £1.57m | £1.83m | £2.58m | £884.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £74.66k | £52.75k | £345.44k | £321.19k | £588.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £42.50k | £405.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £588.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £675.23k | £285.82k | £401.82k | £0 | £2.01m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £22.67m | £23.16m | £29.39m | £28.42m | £28.14m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.62m | £1.01m | £931.33k | £1.31m | £4.71m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £10.70m | £9.24m | £15.11m | £13.88m | £16.24m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 September 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 September 2022 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 18 OCTOBER 1996, 17 AUGUST 2007 AND 24 MAY 2010, AND BY DECLARATION DATED 28 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND/OR BEHAVIOURAL PROBLEMS OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS THOUGH TRAINING IN THE AREAS OF THE ARTS, CRAFTS, AGRICULTURE AND ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THE INDICATIONS AND INSIGHTS OF RUDOLF STEINER IN THESE AREAS. 2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE PRACTICE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THOSE AREAS OF EDUCATION PROVIDED THAT ALL RESEARCH FINDINGS WILL BE WIDELY DISSEMINATED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ruskin Mill
Millbottom
Nailsworth
Stroud
GL6 0LA
- Phone:
- 01453 837500
- Email:
- enquiries@rmlt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window