Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF OUR LADY'S SCHOOL YORK

Charity Number: 1053708
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 26 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2009 23 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2008 25 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 30 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required