Trustees MERLE COMMON AREA TRUST TRUST
Charity number: 1053717

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN WADE | Chair | 10 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lillywhite | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Smith | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nick Morrison | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisette Wade | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hardman | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
NIALL ROBERTS | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
GARETH A CURRIE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.