CKIS PFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money for the Infants' School via various activities eg school fete, quiz night and cake sales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 March 1996: Standard registration
- C K I S P F A (Working name)
- CHARLTON KINGS INFANTS SCHOOL (GRANT MAINTAINED) PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION. (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annalie Smith | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Champness | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hodnett | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.35k | £5.36k | £13.05k | £11.77k | £15.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.30k | £11.49k | £4.23k | £11.71k | £13.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/02/1996 AS AMENDED ON 05/07/2011 as amended on 09 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charlton Kings Infants School
Lyefield Road East
Charlton Kings
Cheltenham
GL53 8AY
- Phone:
- 01242514483
- Email:
- pfa@ckis.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window