Financial history SHROPSHIRE CHILDREN'S SCRAPSTORE, RECYCLING AND RESOURCE CENTRE - SCRAPPIES

Charity number: 1053752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.08k £29.56k £31.53k £33.74k £38.12k
Total expenditure £30.89k £25.27k £30.57k £31.05k £34.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.40k £3.13k N/A N/A