SHROPSHIRE CHILDREN'S SCRAPSTORE, RECYCLING AND RESOURCE CENTRE - SCRAPPIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF A SCRAPSTORE FOR SCRAP MATERIALS TO ASSIST IN TRAINING FOR GROUP PLAY AND PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES MATERAIALS AND EQUIPMENT TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SHROPSHIRE AND TELFORD AND WREKIN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 13 March 1996: Standard registration
- SCRAPPIES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY WESTERMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARGARET ARNFIELD | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY MCKNIGHT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.08k | £29.56k | £31.53k | £33.74k | £38.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.89k | £25.27k | £30.57k | £31.05k | £34.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.40k | £3.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 11 JULY 2002 AND 14 JULY 2008. as amended on 30 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN SHROPSHIRE AND TELFORD & WREKIN & SURROUNDING AREAS, BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MATERIALS AND TRAINING FOR GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS CAN PARTICIPATE WHEN APPROPRIATE. 2. TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES, MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE INHABITANTS OF SHROPSHIRE AND TELFORD & WREKIN & SURROUNDING AREAS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, THAT THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS MAY BE IMPROVED, SUCH PERSONS HAVING NEED OF THE FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1 Sherrat Court
Beaumont Road
CHURCH STRETTON
SY6 6BN
- Phone:
- 01694328508
- Email:
- info@scrappies.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window