ST THOMAS MORE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (DERBYSHIRE)

Charity number: 1053754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School PTA raising funds to support the school curriculum for the young people of St Thomas More School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £1,343
Total expenditure: £2,249

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorraine Maddocks Chair 24 April 2023
None on record
Kerry Taylor Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Melanie Fletcher-Wells Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.42k £13.41k £1.99k £4.94k £1.34k
Total expenditure £4.42k £10.52k £8.40k £970 £2.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Thomas More Catholic School
Palace Road
Buxton
SK17 6AF
Phone:
0129870497