SOUTH YORKSHIRE VICTIM/OFFENDER MEDIATION SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 13 March 1996: Standard registration
- 29 August 2002: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 29 August 2002: Funds transferred to 1091232 REMEDI - RESTORATIVE SERVICES
- REMEDI (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD VICTIM/OFFENDER MEDIATION PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 1 JULY 1998 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND ALSO IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN VICTIMS OF CRIME AND OFFENDERS, WITH A VIEW (A) TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, AND (B) TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE THROUGH THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF SUCH VICTIMS AND THE REHABILITATION OF SUCH OFFENDERS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE METHODS OF SUCH MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION, THE NEEDS OF VICTIMS AND OFFENDERS FOR SUCH SERVICES, AND THE MEANS OF MANAGING SUCH SERVICES.
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND ALSO SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.