BARTON SEAGRAVE COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the education of the pupils of Barton Seagrave primary school by providing or assisting in the provision of educational, recreational & other charitable facilities in augmentation of such facilities financed by the LEA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 15 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Simon Spooner | Chair | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Higson | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAREK SIMON KRZANICKI | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.02k | £20.08k | £21.48k | £46.12k | £61.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.79k | £24.61k | £20.26k | £48.30k | £57.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 15TH FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF BARTON SEAGRAVE COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARTON SEAGRAVE PRIMARY SCHOOL
BELVOIR DRIVE
BARTON SEAGRAVE
KETTERING
NN15 6QY
- Phone:
- 01536722793
- Website:
-
bartonseagraveprimaryschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window