WOOLSTON COMMUNITY PRIMARY PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity organises events and run activities for the children within the school to raise funds for the School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warrington
Governance
- 13 March 1996: Standard registration
- H.O.T (Working name)
- P T A - PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF WOOLSTON COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- HANDS ON TEAM (Previous name)
- WOOSTON COMMUNITY SCHOOL PTFA (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Mary Mather | Chair | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Wheat | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susheela Mehra King | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.01k | £7.34k | £11.33k | £15.62k | £14.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.66k | £5.07k | £12.64k | £17.16k | £13.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/09/1988 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/1995 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Riversdale
Woolston
WARRINGTON
WA1 4PZ
- Phone:
- 07979915481
- Email:
- susheela@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window