Linked charities ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITIES
Charity number: 1053793

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
- BASIL BEAR FUND
- BRENTWOOD SERVICES FUND
- CANCER RELIEF FUND
- CHILDRENS CENTRE FUND
- CONTINENCE CARE FUND
- CONTINUING CARE SERVICES FUND
- DEPARTMENT OF NUTRITION AND DIETETICS FUND
- DIABETIC CARE CENTRE
- DISTRICT NURSES FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BEDS CHILDS HELATH DIRECTORATE FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CANCER CARE GENERAL FUND -
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND -
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST MENTAL HEALTH GENERAL FUND
- ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST STAFF WELFARE
- HEALTH CENTRE AND CLINICS FUND
- HENRICUS OCTAVIUS ROE IN CONNECTION WITH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL, ARLESEY
- LEARNING DISABILITY CHARITY
- LEARNING DISABLILITIES PSYCHIATRY ACADEMIC AND RESEARCH FOUNDATION
- MENTAL HEALTH CHARITY
- MENTAL HEALTH RESEARCH FOUNDATION
- PHYSIOTHERAPY SERVICES FUND
- PRIMARY CARE CHARITY
- PRIMARY CARE TRUST GENERAL PURPOSE FUND
- PRIMARY CARE TRUST STAFF WELFARE FUND
- PSYCHIATRIC RESEARCH FUND
- PSYCHOLOGY SERVICES FUND
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL GENERAL
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL PATIENTS WELFARE
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL STAFF WELFARE
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FARINGDON WING
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH FARINGDON WING PATIENTS WELFARE
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH MENTAL HEALTH GENERAL
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH MENTAL HEALTH PATIENTS AND STAFF WELFARE
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH MENTAL HEALTH PATIENTS WELFARE
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST AMPTHILL AND DISTRICT GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BEDS RURAL GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BEDS URBAN GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BIGGLESWADE AND DISTRICT GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST LEARNING DISABILITIES GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST MENTAL HEALTH TRAINING/EQUIPMENT FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST OTHER LOCALITY SERVICES GENERAL FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST PATIENTS WELFARE FUND
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST VERANDAH PROJECT FUND
- SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPY FUND
- THE MARGARET ETHEL BOLTON FUND
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/03/97 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18/12/2002, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST AUGUST 2006 AND 31 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF CHILDREN (INCLUDING CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES) WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN TREATED AT SOUTH WEST ESSEX PRIMARY CARE TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 05 March 2003 : Standard registration
- 26 June 2017 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.