FIRS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money ad hoc requirements from the Senior Leadership Team at school and continuing to help replenish playground equipment,supplement swimming lessons for Yr 4 children and contributing towards new books for the betterment of the children and school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 19 March 1996: Standard registration
- THE FIRS SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- FIRS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Leonard | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Venes | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pardeep Uppal | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sima Vaghela | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ketley | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.19k | £5.89k | £44.89k | £7.10k | £22.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.41k | £7.35k | £36.58k | £6.20k | £21.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 9 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
AMPTHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRS LOWER SCHOOL
STATION ROAD
AMPTHILL
BEDFORD
MK45 2QR
- Phone:
- 01525402735
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window