Accounts and annual returns SOUTH LONDON CONGOLESE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1053836
Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required