WEST LANCASHIRE CARERS SITTING IN SERVICE
Charity Number: 1053839
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of elderly, infirm or disabled persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Total income: £15,421
Total expenditure: £28,605
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Lancashire
Governance
Registration history:
- 18 March 1996: Standard registration
- 20 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- SITTING IN SERVICE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.77k | £55.26k | £23.49k | £43.94k | £15.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.19k | £54.28k | £59.02k | £54.45k | £28.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 08 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 08 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 15 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY, INFIRM OR DISABLED PERSONS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WEST LANCASHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window