Financial history SOUTHBOURNE (WEST SUSSEX ) LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1053845
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £7.53k £7.99k £9.23k £7.03k £8.99k
Total expenditure £7.04k £6.30k £9.79k £5.88k £10.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A