BEERAAHAAR SWEET COMBINATION SOCA MAS CULTURAL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beeraahaar Sweet Combination offers a wide range of artistic skills in carnival craft: The ability to design large scale artwork - "mas pieces" paint & decorate artwork: Banner making, design and make body 'carnival' costume & gain confidence to participate in various carnivals & self esteem.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2018
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 March 1996: Standard registration
- BEERAAHAAR SWEET COMBINATION (Working name)
- SWEET COMBINATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINA OREE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
FLORENCE DAVID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUSSEL ANTHONY KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEVERLY WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALETHEA STEWART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.23k | £14.56k | £2.67k | £16.26k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.55k | £16.14k | £1.61k | £15.38k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | £700 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £800 | N/A | £15.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 950 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 950 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1315 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1315 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1680 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1680 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 8TH NOVEMBER 1998 AND 10TH NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING CARIBBEAN AND AFRO-CARIBBEAN CULTURE, IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS, DANCE, MUSIC, MASS MAKING AND COSTUME DESIGN.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
35B CRANWICH ROAD
LONDON
N16 5HZ
- Phone:
- 07481654555
- Email:
- BEERAAHAAR@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
itzcaribeean.com/beeraahaar
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window