WOODLANDS JUNIOR SCHOOL VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1053887
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Total income: £73,597
Total expenditure: £75,553
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Kent
Governance
Registration history:
- 19 March 1996: Standard registration
- 20 May 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- WOODLANDS JUNIOR SCHOOL VOLUNTARY FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.02k | £79.60k | £86.92k | £75.19k | £73.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.60k | £79.20k | £86.51k | £77.18k | £75.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 24 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 24 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 18 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 23 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 01 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 01 May 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28.2.96.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN WOODLANDS SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE CATCHMENT AREA OF SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.