Accounts and annual returns HELP OVERCOME PANIC EFFECTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1053922
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 08 April 2008 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 14 April 2008 74 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 12 February 2008 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted