Trustees TUTSHILL COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1053927

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Mills | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Carruthers-Watt | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Thompson | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ivy Benjamin | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lara Berroth | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Andrews-Nicholas | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
EMILY VAN DER HEIJDEN | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.