THE LOWRY CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The encouragement of the arts and the promotion of arts education by presenting a diverse, wide-ranging programme of events, exhibitions and activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£25,323,643
Donations and legacies | £1.98m | |
Charitable activities | £16.54m | |
Other trading activities | £6.73m | |
Investments | £74.11k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£27,761,439
Raising funds | £6.87m | |
Charitable activities | £20.74m | |
Other | £150.56k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £331,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,611,984 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.02m | |
Charitable expenditure | £20.74m |
People

321 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 22 March 1996: Standard registration
- THE LOWRY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Leyland | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wylie | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nazir Afzal | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|||||
PHILIP RICHARD EAST | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jatin Aythora | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Hammond | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jaiden Corfield | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Gibson | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roli Barker | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Kasmir | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas John Stannard | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Antony Dennett | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARONESS JANE MARY BONHAM-CARTER | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
RT HON BARONESS BEVERLEY JUNE HUGHES | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BLACKBURN OBE | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR BILL HINDS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANE FROST | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.27m | £12.03m | £18.48m | £35.08m | £25.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.01m | £11.67m | £20.89m | £30.74m | £27.76m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £605.00k | £331.00k | £331.00k | £331.00k | £331.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.20m | £8.01m | £2.55m | £1.93m | £1.61m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.87m | £8.04m | £377.00k | £8.26m | £1.98m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.84m | £2.42m | £4.27m | £7.55m | £6.73m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £16.57m | £1.57m | £11.28m | £17.01m | £16.54m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £27.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.00k | £1.00k | £28 | £1.07k | £74.11k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £2.55m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £19.11m | £6.91m | £14.53m | £19.26m | £20.74m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.90m | £4.76m | £6.37m | £99.27k | £6.87m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £32.00k | £32.00k | £38.00k | £46.00k | £42.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £439.18k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £11.38m | £150.56k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £49.10m | £46.94m | £44.27m | £51.38m | £8.63m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £630.41k | £0 | £40.88m | |
|
Other assets | £7.33m | £16.26m | £18.14m | £15.18m | £16.49m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.29m | £13.74m | £16.14m | £15.33m | £17.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 JULY 1997 AND 28 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ARTISTIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN IN PARTICULAR SALFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lowry
Pier 8
The Quays
SALFORD
M50 3AZ
- Phone:
- 01618762020
- Email:
- info@thelowry.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window