WITNEY ROUND TABLE 499 CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1053971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our fund raising activities include Witney Beer Festival, Witney Carnival and a door-to-door Christmas collection. Funds and time are donated to charities and worthy causes in Witney and the surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £11,186
Total expenditure: £12,140

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 1996: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 05 October 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • WITNEY ROUND TABLE 499 (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Craig Brown Chair 01 April 2021
None on record
Andrew Sparrowhawk Trustee 20 April 2017
None on record
JAMES LESLIE BEST Trustee 20 April 2017
None on record
MAJOR BRENDAN JOHN KAY Trustee 20 April 2017
None on record
Luke Daniel Wiseman Trustee 20 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.22k £4.17k £4.35k £7.24k £11.19k
Total expenditure £9.15k £5.75k £5.28k £3.71k £12.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 June 2024 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Marsh Walk
WITNEY
OX28 1YF
Phone:
07941732399