Accounts and annual returns SLEAFORD AND DISTRICT FURNITURE RECYCLING PROJECT

Charity Number: 1053977
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 23 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2017 06 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 06 February 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2016 10 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 14 February 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2015 08 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 10 February 2016 On Time