Financial history SLEAFORD AND DISTRICT FURNITURE RECYCLING PROJECT

Charity Number: 1053977
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £81.96k £77.17k £70.28k £59.05k £55.74k
Total expenditure £88.01k £87.42k £79.97k £84.31k £77.83k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £0