SLEAFORD AND DISTRICT FURNITURE RECYCLING PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote establish and secure the recycling by re-use of furniture in Sleaford & District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 March 1996: Standard registration
- 04 December 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.96k | £77.17k | £70.28k | £59.05k | £55.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.01k | £87.42k | £79.97k | £84.31k | £77.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 06 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 06 February 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 10 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 14 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 08 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | 10 February 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED 1 FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN SLEAFORD AND DISTRICT BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FURNITURE AND HOUSE NECESSITIES OF ALL DESCRIPTIONS
Area of benefit
SLEAFORD AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window