CLIENTEARTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ClientEarth's objects are the promotion and protection of the environment for the public benefit by the use of the law, to provide legal assistance to those who otherwise do not have access thereto, to promote education on environmental rights and responsibilities and to conduct research thereon. We will achieve these goals through advocacy, litigation, and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£29,449,150
Donations and legacies | £7.89m | |
Charitable activities | £20.98m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £501.04k | |
Other | £77.87k |
Total expenditure:
£35,153,156
Raising funds | £3.53m | |
Charitable activities | £31.63m | |
Other | £0 |
-£305,106 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.53m | |
Charitable expenditure | £31.63m |
People

292 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 31 |
£70k to £80k | 14 |
£80k to £90k | 10 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 3 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- China
- Congo
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Ivory Coast
- Liberia
- Poland
- Spain
Governance
- 26 March 1996: Standard registration
- EARTHRIGHTS (Working name)
- EARTHRIGHTS:THE ENVIRONMENTAL LAW AND RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Howard Boyd | Chair | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Clarke | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wangechi Wanyoike | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Champa Khimji Patel | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr KILAPARTI RAMAKRISHNA | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Charles Rivett-Carnac | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Frances Wild | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Lyman Reid | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Assaad Wajdi Razzouk | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Medina Gomez | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Georg Stratenwerth | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Frances Beinecke | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ENO | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
WINSOME MCINTOSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.49m | £20.79m | £28.32m | £30.94m | £29.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.20m | £16.85m | £21.64m | £28.13m | £35.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £70.19k | £91.91k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.06m | £1.04m | £926.68k | £856.20k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £17.89m | £4.58m | £6.04m | £9.07m | £7.89m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £2.10m | £3.07m | £1.04m | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.41m | £13.86m | £18.92m | £20.49m | £20.98m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £118.66k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £30.99k | £155.11k | £191.21k | £233.82k | £501.04k | |
|
Income - Other | £150.83k | £91.29k | £103.23k | £114.42k | £77.87k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £14.00k | £0 | £5.00k | £84.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.38m | £15.68m | £19.65m | £25.33m | £31.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £814.43k | £1.17m | £1.98m | £2.79m | £3.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £98.27k | £79.17k | £69.28k | £261.04k | £295.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £591.99k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £4.77k | £0 | £48.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £166.77k | £325.93k | £961.89k | £816.28k | £947.13k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £12.76m | £13.54m | £14.02m | £15.69m | |
|
Other assets | £21.14m | £14.13m | £22.52m | £26.19m | £17.95m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £422.30k | £1.16m | £3.65m | £4.98m | £4.55m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH OCTOBER 1993, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION INCORPORATED 18TH MAY 1994 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 11TH MARCH 1996. ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY RESOLUTION OF 17 NOVEMBER 2010 as amended on 26 Apr 2018 as amended on 25 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
(I)TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE ENHANCEMENT, RESTORATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING THE PROTECTION OF HUMAN HEALTH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE LAW, PRACTICE AND ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE IN CONNECTION WITH THE ENVIRONMENT; (3)TO RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LEGAL SERVICES TO THOSE WHO CANNOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THEM; (4)TO PROMOTE, ASSIST, UNDERTAKE AND COMMISSION RESEARCH INTO THE LAW, PRACTICE, AND ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE IN CONNECTION WITH THE ENVIRONMENT AND MATTERS RELATING THERETO, INCLUDING THE IMPACT, DIRECT OR INDIRECT, OF ANY HUMAN ACTIVITY ON THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Joinery
34 Drayton Park
London
N5 1PB
- Phone:
- 02077495970
- Email:
- info@clientearth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window