BETESDA

Charity number: 1054022
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising funds to contribute to running costs of old peoples' homes in Romania & other charitable enterprises on occasion

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019

Total income: £41,085
Total expenditure: £42,651

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk
  • Romania

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1996: Standard registration
  • 26 March 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £38.37k £33.45k £46.86k £43.25k £41.09k
Total expenditure £40.91k £31.24k £50.25k £41.51k £42.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late