ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF BARFORD COURT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General fund raising in and around the Brighton area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Hopper-Young | Chair | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip George Robinson | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel McLusky | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lee Williams | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John William Fortin | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA MOORE | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Silvester Mills | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Joshua Field | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Terrence Whiteside | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dedman | Trustee | 05 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER AUGUSTE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.74k | £16.18k | £9.53k | £9.30k | £11.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.97k | £20.74k | £7.80k | £12.85k | £8.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 January 2021 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH MARCH 1996 AMENDED 5 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN HOVE SUSSEX PARTICULARLY BY SUPPORTING ASSISTING AND SUPPLEMENTING THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF BARFORD COURT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED -- IN PRACTICE HOVE SUSSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 16
Prince Of Wales Court
227-229 Kingsway
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 4HF
- Phone:
- 01273 327960
- Email:
- mikejfortin@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window