Trustees ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF BARFORD COURT
Charity number: 1054042

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Hopper-Young | Chair | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip George Robinson | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel McLusky | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lee Williams | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John William Fortin | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA MOORE | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Silvester Mills | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Joshua Field | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Terrence Whiteside | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dedman | Trustee | 05 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER AUGUSTE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.