THE GEORGE ELIOT FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fellowship exists to honour the memory of George Eliot, to encourage others to study her work, and to put on events which involve walks, tours, study, reading groups, visits to literary venues, publications, displays and exhibitions connected with increasing appreciation of the writer by members and the public in the Uk and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 26 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BURTON | Chair |
|
||||||||
MADELEINE ANNE HUGHES | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
SYLVIA IRENE MARTIN | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID JAMES LEACH | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Robert William Everitt | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Somerville | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Joy Redfern | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ELAINE PEAKE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.50k | £11.57k | £17.49k | £14.44k | £13.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.64k | £8.55k | £18.26k | £13.84k | £4.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | £3.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 January 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
A.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE LIFE AND WORKS OF GEORGE ELIOT. B.FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COUNCIL SHALL DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Lower Road
Barnacle
Coventry
CV7 9LD
- Phone:
- 02476 619126
- Email:
- johnkburton43@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window