Financial history JMC TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1054076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.15k £12.41k £1.62k £36.01k £14.55k
Total expenditure £5.39k £10.68k £6.53k £360 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A