Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL CENTRAL GOSPEL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1054082
Charity reporting is up to date (129 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 October 2024 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 18 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 04 July 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 04 July 2023 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 11 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window