RAINBOW PRE- SCHOOL

Charity number: 1054083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Local Preschool providing educational and development facilities for children under the statutory school age.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £157,249
Total expenditure: £183,140

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 March 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLAIRE ONYETT Chair 01 September 2023
None on record
Sean Onyett Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Sarah Marett Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
Joanne Gibson Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Alexandra Otoo Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
Thomas Marett Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £155.28k £151.10k £106.93k £138.58k £157.25k
Total expenditure £136.80k £122.32k £125.92k £157.59k £183.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £132.10k £1.72k £1.74k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2023 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 June 2023 343 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 December 2021 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 December 2021 168 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 October 2020 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 October 2020 118 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RAINBOW PRESCHOOL
The Village Hall
Village Square
Springfield
CHELMSFORD
CM2 6RF
Phone:
07470088831