CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY RELIEF, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT FOR THE HOMELESS AND HOSPICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CRASH is a grant making charity, providing grants, pro bono professional expertise and materials to Homelessness Charities and Hospices to improve their buildings. CRASH acts as a facilitator, for companies in the construction industry to help homeless people and people with life limiting illnesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,161,073
Donations and legacies | £1.02m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £97.71k | |
Investments | £40.69k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,221,355
Raising funds | £97.46k | |
Charitable activities | £1.12m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £97.46k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.12m |
People

6 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 March 1996: Standard registration
- 20 April 2023: Funds received from 1118737 THE RYDON GROUP CHARITABLE TRUST
- C R A S H (Working name)
- CRASH (Working name)
- CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE FOR THE SINGLE HOMELESS LIMITED (Previous name)
- CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY RELIEF, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT FOR THE HOMELESS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Jean Aird Carraz | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Modell | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guy Norton | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David McGarry | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John O'Grady | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Grant Pullen | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Bolster | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Duncombe | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Allan Paul Corbett | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.51m | £796.65k | £871.33k | £1.08m | £1.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.40m | £800.00k | £751.12k | £1.13m | £1.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.39m | £693.52k | £788.55k | £954.02k | £1.02m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £119.74k | £101.35k | £81.49k | £110.98k | £97.71k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.77k | £1.78k | £1.29k | £14.08k | £40.69k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.28m | £698.34k | £669.74k | £1.04m | £1.12m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £121.41k | £101.66k | £81.38k | £92.71k | £97.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.44k | £7.51k | £7.75k | £9.17k | £10.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £243.73k | £204.91k | £186.50k | £377.29k | £435.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £514 | £704 | £524 | £344 | £165 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.13m | £1.12m | £1.25m | £1.37m | £1.46m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £298.31k | £292.74k | £304.52k | £474.76k | £624.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR FACILITATING ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HOMELESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRASH c/o Arcadis
80 Fenchurch Street
London
EC3M 4BY
- Phone:
- 02087420717
- Email:
- tpickersgill@crash.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window