MOLESEY JUNIORS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of Sports Ground and Associated Buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
dawn taylor | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
FARMER ERNEST MALLETT | Trustee | 02 April 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.23k | £15.50k | £13.80k | £5.64k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.88k | £15.40k | £12.94k | £1.56k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF MOLESEY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF OUTDOOR SPORTING ACTIVITIES AS THE DEVELOPMENT OF A SPORTS GROUND FOR THIS PURPOSE
Area of benefit
EAST MOLESEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WALTON ROAD
EAST MOLESEY
KT8 0DF
- Phone:
- 02089796446
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window